Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for certain time periods; increasing, except under certain circumstances, the State minimum wage rate based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Washington-Baltimore metropolitan area; specifying the tip credit amount that is in effect for certain time periods; prohibiting an employer, beginning July 1, 2026, from including the tip credit amount as part of the wage of certain employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0664
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-413, 3-419 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM