Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - No-Zero Grading Policy - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bailey, Cassilly, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county board of education from establishing a no-zero grading policy.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0667 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - No-Zero Grading Policy - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - No-Zero Grading Policy - Prohibition
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM