Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Ferguson, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering and renaming the Construction Apprenticeship Assistance Program to establish the Apprenticeship Career Training in Our Neighborhoods (ACTION) Program; altering the purpose and method for administering the Program; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to administer the Program; establishing specified standards under which specified employers may be eligible to receive grants; establishing a maximum grant amount of $1,000 for each apprentice employed that satisfies specified criteria; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0290
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797871/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-32)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {797871/1 Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (102-32) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM