Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum rate of the admissions and amusement tax that a county or municipal corporation may set for gross receipts that are also subject to the State sales and use tax; altering the rate of the sales and use tax; altering the percentage of gross receipts from vending machine sales to which the sales and use tax rate is applied; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0457 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 11-301, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM