Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities; requiring the Task Force to study achievements made in the past 20 years in combating substandard canine breeding practices and current efforts and standards relating to canine breeding; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations and report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/4/2021 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page