Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsored by
Senators Reilly and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the holders of specified alcoholic beverages manufacturing and retail licenses and refillable container permits may refill specified containers that are branded by a specified holder of a refillable container permit; authorizing the issuance of refillable container permits in certain jurisdictions to the holders of specified licenses for specified fees and subject to specified requirements; establishing a refillable container permit in Prince George's County and in St. Mary's County; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0208
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523992/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {503094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {114234/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 46
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {523992/1 Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {503094/1 Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 61
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-113, 21-107, 2-206, 5-201, 5-401, 6-201, 7-101, 8-103, 8-202, 8-202.2, 8-203, 8-204.10, 8-207, 8-210, 8-212, 8-213.3, 8-217.1, 8-219.1, 9-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM