Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor Permit
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Calvert County a special event (festival) beer, wine and liquor (on-sale) permit; specifying the type of license holder to which the Board of License Commissioners may issue the permit, subject to specified limitations; requiring an applicant to demonstrate a reasonable expectation of attendance at the special event of at least 750 patrons; specifying a permit fee of $100; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614639/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543492/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {713594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {223022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {614639/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {543492/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {713594/1 Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {223022/1 Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM