Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Feldman, and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves certain population centers along the I-270 corridor and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department, in conducting the study, to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to make certain recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 9:04 AM