Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing, for purposes of a provision of law prohibiting a person from knowingly, willfully, and with fraudulent intent, possessing, obtaining, or helping another to possess or obtain personal identifying information for specified purposes, a limitation that a specified benefit, credit, good, service, thing of value, health information, or health care be obtained or accessed in the name of an individual.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM