Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Bates, Conway, Eckardt, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Lee, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Young, Astle, Benson, and Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; and extending the termination date of specified provisions of law that establish and govern the Council to September 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407271/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406085/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {407271/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {406085/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3201, 13-3203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM