Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Ellis, Feldman, Hayes, Hester, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain allowable union dues paid by the individual during the taxable year if the union dues would have been allowed as a deduction under the Internal Revenue Code for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2018; providing for the calculation of the credit; making the credit refundable; defining "allowable union dues"; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2026; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0111
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM