Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Middleton, Peters, Serafini, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain money in the Maryland Prepaid College Trust may not be considered money of or be commingled with the Maryland Broker-Dealer College Investment Plan or the Maryland ABLE program; requiring the Maryland 529 Board to allow the transfer of funds from certain trusts and plans to any qualified ABLE program; altering the limit on money and assets that a certain account holder can contribute to an ABLE account during a certain period of time; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {309138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456280/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Death of a Designated Beneficiary
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {309138/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {456280/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text - Chapter - Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1903, 18-1905.1, 18-1909, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19B-01, 18-19B-02, 18-19C-01, 18-19C-02, 18-19C-03, 18-19C-09, 18-19C-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM