Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Advisory Council - Clinical Crisis Walk-In Services and Mobile Crisis Teams - Strategic Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Kelley, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Behavioral Health Advisory Council, in consultation with specified agencies, specified health providers, and specified stakeholders, to develop a strategic plan for ensuring that clinical crisis walk-in services and mobile crisis teams are available statewide, 7 days a week and 24 hours a day; requiring the Council to submit an annual report on or before December 31, 2016, and include an update on the development of the specified strategic plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757471/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {757471/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM