Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman and Jacobs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing in Harford County a specified restriction on the use of a corporate dining room in an establishment for which a specified Class H-CC (corporate club/conference center alcoholic beverages) license is issued; authorizing the holder of a Class H-CC license to keep for sale and sell beer, wine, and liquor in specified other rooms and areas and to hold specified additional events; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794634/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Glassman) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323791/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {794634/1 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Glassman) Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 38
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {323791/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM