Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2021, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; prohibiting a certain number of individuals appointed as certain members of the Board from holding a certain credential; requiring the Board to create an Alcohol and Drug Counselor Subcommittee to perform certain functions; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0742
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {194031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {194031/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Text - Chapter - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
(   17-202, 17-205, 17-302, 17-303, 17-304, 17-304.1, 17-305, 17-403, 17-404, 17-405, 17-502, 17-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page