Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers from requiring a tipped employee to reimburse or pay the employer specified amounts under specified circumstances; prohibiting employers from deducting specified amounts from a tipped employee under specified circumstances; and requiring specified employers to post notices in specified places in a form required by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197879/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-31)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {197879/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 40
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (107-31) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM