Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Manno, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified insured to elect to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage, instead of specified uninsured motorist coverage, under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy under specified circumstances; requiring specified insurers to offer enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; providing for the characteristics of that enhanced underinsured motorist coverage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0667
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0614 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.1, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-510.1, 19-511, 19-511.1, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM