Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and Certification
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the licensure as a private process service agency of any person who provides specified private process service; providing for the terms and renewals of the licenses, qualifications for and duties of licensees, display of licenses, and required records of a licensee; establishing specified administrative, financial, and surety bond requirements for a licensed private process service agency; establishing qualifications for and duties of certified private process servers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13.5-101 through 13.5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM