Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Appointments to Fill a Vacancy
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint an individual to fill a vacancy in the office of United States Senator, Attorney General, or Comptroller from a list of names submitted by the State Central Committee of the political party of the vacating officeholder; requiring individuals whose names are submitted to the Governor to have been affiliated with the political party of the vacating officeholder before the vacancy occurred; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM