Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Senator, Attorney General, and Comptroller - Temporary Appointments and Special Elections to Fill a Vacancy
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require the Governor to appoint an individual to fill a vacancy on a temporary basis, under specified circumstances, in the office of Attorney General, Comptroller, or U.S. Senator from a list of names submitted by the State Central Committee of the political party of the vacating officeholder; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a specified vacancy to serve until a successor is elected; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0288
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {954935/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM