Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State's Attorney to be a party to, and have specified rights in, specified proceedings relating to the release of a person committed to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene as not criminally responsible under the test for criminal responsibility; providing for specified de novo hearings in specified release cases where the underlying crime is a specified crime of violence; authorizing a court considering a specified release to continue its hearing to take additional evidence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-114 through 3-120, 3-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM