Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act relating to prescription drug benefits apply to specified coverage offered in specified markets; altering the circumstances under which specified health benefit plans are required to allow specified individuals to enroll for specified coverage; altering the process for selection of the State benchmark plan used to establish specified essential health benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537971/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {686189/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-14)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {537971/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {686189/2 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-14) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-703.1 )
(   15-10A-01, 15-1201, 15-1208.1, 15-1208.2, 15-1212, 15-1301, 15-1309, 15-1310, 15-1311, 15-1312, 15-1316, 15-1318, 15-137.1, 15-1401, 15-1403, 15-1404, 15-1405, 15-1408, 15-1409, 15-802, 15-831, 27-210, 31-101, 31-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM