Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Misrepresentations by Applicant
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an insurer to rescind a policy or binder of personal automobile insurance if an applicant makes specified misrepresentations; requiring the insurer to provide specified notice to an applicant that specified insurance coverage may be rescinded under specified circumstances; requiring an insurer to take specified actions before rescinding specified insurance coverage; applying the Act to all policies and binders of personal automobile insurance issued or delivered in the State on or after October 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page