Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit insurers, nonprofit health service plans, or health maintenance organizations from offering products or services at no charge or at a discounted price for certain purposes; prohibiting an insurer, a nonprofit health service plan, or a health maintenance organization from discontinuing a certain service or product during the term of the policy or contract except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to make certain determinations by regulation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {947573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {947573/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Insurance - Product and Service Offerings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Economic Matters 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-209, 27-210, 27-211, 27-212 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:10 PM