Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Sheriff of Carroll County receive an annual salary of $90,000 beginning on December 1, 2014, and thereafter; providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the Sheriff of Carroll County while serving in a specified term of office; and providing that a specified limitation does not apply to a specified individual.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 38
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM