Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Astle, Brochin, Ferguson, Jennings, Kagan, Lee, Manno, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering for sale within the State specified food fish or shellfish unless the person identifies the species of food fish or shellfish in a specified manner; prohibiting a person from knowingly misidentifying the species of specified food fish or shellfish on a label, sign, or menu; prohibiting a person from knowingly selling or offering for sale within the State specified crab products identified as "blue crab" except under specified conditions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0760
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11F-01 through 4-11F-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM