Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Members of the National Guard - Employment and Reemployment Rights - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Salling
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing members of the National Guard whose employment and reemployment rights have been violated to bring a civil action for economic damages, including lost wages and benefits; and authorizing a court to award specified damages, fees, costs, and other relief to members of the National Guard if the court determines that the member's employment and reemployment rights were violated.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0249
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524834/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {524834/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 46
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM