Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to solicit input from certain stakeholders and study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim and a final report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019, and December 1, 2020, respectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0660
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM