Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - Codified
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Currie, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Pugh, Nathan-Pulliam, and Conway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program to provide investment in local housing and businesses focusing on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable impact; establishing the types of community enhancement projects eligible to receive Program funds; providing that community enhancement projects may be located in more than one political subdivision; requiring the Governor to include a $12,000,000 appropriation to the Fund in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2018 through 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0684
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959338/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959338/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {393720/1 Rejected (14-28)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {283724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {893323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {959338/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted 53
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {959338/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {393720/1 Rejected (14-28) 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator McFadden) Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {283724/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {893323/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 through 6-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM