Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Hershey
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from 60 to 90 the number of days within which the Department of Natural Resources is required to hold a hearing for a person who holds an authorization to catch oysters and receives a citation for a certain offense; establishing that the Department is not required to hold a hearing if a certain assistant Attorney General determines that it is unable to establish the facts necessary to succeed in the hearing; requiring the Department to report annually on certain oyster poaching-related penalties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584834/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {584834/1 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {584834/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 43
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM