Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore County Board of License Commissioners to transfer, convert, and issue a specified license for an establishment that is at least 100 feet away from a place of worship under specified circumstances and subject to specified restrictions and qualifications; and making a specified exception to a prohibition against issuing a license for an establishment that is within 300 feet of a place of worship or school.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {454236/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Text - Chapter - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of Worship
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-1601, 13-1710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM