Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study – Protecting Unemployed Maryland During the Next Recession
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Spending Affordability Committee to study the impact of a recession on the utilization of social safety net programs; requiring the Committee to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding the use of subaccounts in the State Reserve Fund to avoid a reduction in social safety net programs during a recession; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Study – Protecting Unemployed Maryland During the Next Recession
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Study – Protecting Unemployed Maryland During the Next Recession
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM