Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim Credit
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date from September 15 to November 15 by which an individual or a corporation is required to submit a certain application for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain research and development expenses incurred by the individual or corporation; altering the date from December 15 to February 15 by which the Department of Commerce shall certify the credits approved for the individual or corporation; altering the method by which the individual or corporation may claim the credit; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim Credit
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim Credit
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Application for and Procedure to Claim Credit
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page