Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Use of Handcuffs - Body Attachments Policy
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission, by October 1, 2020, to develop written policies to provide guidance to law enforcement agencies on the appropriate use of handcuffs when taking a person into custody on a body attachment; and requiring each law enforcement agency, by January 1, 2021, to adopt and implement the written policy developed by the Commission.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Use of Handcuffs - Body Attachments Policy
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM