Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Departments - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of funding required to be included in the State budget for local health services for certain fiscal years; altering the purposes for which local health department funding may be used to include protective equipment for certain health care personnel and materials appropriate to prepare for potential communicable disease emergencies; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a certain evaluation by December 1, 2021; requiring the Department to submit a certain report by December 15, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Departments - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Local Health Departments - Funding
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Last Updated: 3/6/2021 11:25 AM
Click to return on the top page