Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the annual interest rate that the Comptroller sets for tax deficiencies and refunds to be 3 percentage points above the average prime rate of interest quoted by commercial banks to large businesses during the State's previous fiscal year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159332/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {159332/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Ways and Means 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page