Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Bailey, Benson, Gallion, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Lam, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, Salling, and West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of hours of continuing education that therapeutically certified optometrists are required to attend from 30 to 40; providing that continuing education on use and management of certain therapeutic pharmaceutical agents include a certain topic; prohibiting certain provisions of law regarding therapeutic pharmaceutical agents from being construed to authorize the optometric use of certain pharmaceutical agents, medical devices, or technologies; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Practice of Optometry - Therapeutically Certified Optometrists
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-309, 11-404.2, 11-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM