Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public Service
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making performance of specified public service a mandatory rather than an optional penalty for the criminal offense of littering; requiring a person who unlawfully disposes of litter to be ordered to perform a specified number of hours of public service relating to the removal of the litter disposed of or the restoration of a specified polluted area; and making the number of hours of public service that is required correlate to the amount of litter unlawfully disposed of.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM