Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources, on or before December 1 of each year, to report to the General Assembly specified information regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the Department to maintain the confidentiality of specified information and disaggregate the information by county, age, gender, race, and ethnicity; requiring the Department to publish specified reports on the Department's Web site within 30 days of submission of the report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0643
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638072/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {638072/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49
House 3/26/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1301, 5-1312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM