Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Floating Garden Equipment
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax for the purchase price of equipment used to install or maintain a floating garden; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be refundable or carried forward to another taxable year; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1441
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM