Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on the inclusion, in a policy that insures a health care provider against damages due to medical injury arising from providing or failing to provide health care, of coverage for the defense of a health care provider in a specified disciplinary hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0724
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0832 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM