Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Klausmeier, Robinson, Salling, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain vision screenings to be given in certain years to certain students unless evidence is presented that the student has been tested by an optometrist or ophthalmologist within the past year; requiring the results of certain screening be given to the parents or guardians of each student along with certain educational materials; requiring that additional information provided to parents or guardians of students who fail a vision screening include recommendations for follow-up and medical assistance programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vision Disorders - Requirements for Student Screening - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vision Disorders - Requirements for Student Screening - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {364935/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 60
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text - Chapter - Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM