Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, McFadden, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a civil offense, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person acting in a professional capacity to fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; making it a misdemeanor, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person acting in a professional capacity to fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; authorizing a police officer to issue a citation for a specified civil violation under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0856
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015, July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-601.2 )
(   5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM