Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a landowner, without the approval of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, to erect and display on land subject to a certain easement a certain sign or outdoor advertising display for a certain purpose; authorizing the Foundation to authorize a landowner to erect and display on land subject to a certain easement a certain sign or outdoor advertising display for the purpose of providing certain information; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page