Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Early Learning Challenge and School Readiness Act (Race to the Tots)
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Early Learning Challenge and School Readiness Grant Program in the State Department of Education; providing for the purpose and priorities of the Program; establishing the Early Learning Challenge and School Readiness Grant Program Fund as a special fund to be used for specified purposes; requiring the Department to submit a specified report to the General Assembly on or before a specified date each year; authorizing the Department to accept money from specified sources to award grants under the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0925
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM