Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to a certain amount each year for certain individuals who are receiving certain benefits under the Social Security Act, or who are at least 65 years old and are not employed full time; establishing certain limits on the subtraction modification for certain taxable years; prohibiting income included in certain subtraction modifications from being included under the subtraction modification; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0733
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0278 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 9:22 AM
Click to return on the top page