Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Eckardt, Guzzone, and Norman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways; providing that the purpose of the Task Force is to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of short and long distance truck hauling of the specified products, including safety impacts, infrastructure needs, and associated costs the State Highway Administration incurs; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0698
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {318373/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {318373/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM