Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person to obtain a kennel license from a local licensing agency if the person owns or has custody of 6 or more, instead of 15 or more, unspayed female dogs over the age of 6 months kept for specified breeding purposes or if the person sells dogs from six or more litters in a year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {204237/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text - Chapter - Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM