Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Rate Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of certain provisions of law making sales and charges related to peer-to-peer car sharing subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; requiring the Comptroller to distribute revenue from the sales and use tax imposed on peer-to-peer car sharing to the Transportation Trust Fund and to the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund; altering the sales and use tax rate imposed on certain short-term vehicle rentals and shared motor vehicles used for peer-to-peer car sharing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599039/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Rate Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 12:08 PM