Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for specified sales of bottled water; clarifying that the exemption does not apply to specified sales of bottled water; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM